McIntire, et al v United States of America
Plaintiff: Autumn Renee Hopkins, Natasha Blumenstock and Amy McIntire
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00046
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346t
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy McIntire, Autumn Renee Hopkins, Natasha Blumenstock. United States of America served on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Helvey, Larry)
July 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy McIntire, Autumn Renee Hopkins, Natasha Blumenstock. (Helvey, Larry)
July 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy McIntire, Autumn Renee Hopkins, Natasha Blumenstock. United States of America served on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Helvey, Larry) Modified on 7/8/2019 (bp - Correct answer due date).
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons: Counsel should download the attached summons. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (bp)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3848061., filed by AMY MCINTIRE, AUTUMN RENEE HOPKINS, NATASHA BLUMENSTOCK. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/17/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Helvey, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntire, et al v United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autumn Renee Hopkins
Represented By: Larry D Helvey
Represented By: Robert Tencate Rosenstiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Blumenstock
Represented By: Larry D Helvey
Represented By: Robert Tencate Rosenstiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy McIntire
Represented By: Larry D Helvey
Represented By: Robert Tencate Rosenstiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?