Norberg et al v. Menard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Seth Norberg and Howard Norberg
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00052
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger no longer assigned to case. (rmj)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. Status Conference set for 2/26/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 4/27/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 6/25/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 8/28/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 10/28/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/11/2019. (imk)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/11/2019. (imk)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting #8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 10/11/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 1/30/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/30/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/1/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 5/1/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 6/15/2020. Discovery Deadline 8/1/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 9/1/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2021 11:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 2/15/2021 09:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Estimated length of four days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/11/2019. (imk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 9/11/2019. Attorney Michelle Schneiderheinze appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Kerrie Murphy appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 13 minutes. (imk)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER OF REFERENCE - CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This matter is referred to Chief United States Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams for all further proceedings and entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and the consent of the parties. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 9/11/2019. (hfh)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Errata Motion for Protective Order and finding as moot #9 Motion for Protective Order. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/9/2019. (imk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Errata re #9 Motion for Protective Order filed by Menard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Kerrie)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Errata Corrected Document re #8 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. (Murphy, Kerrie)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Due to a scheduling conflict, the Scheduling Conference originally set for 9/10/2019 is continued to 9/11/2019 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/5/2019. (imk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 *** SEE ENTRY #12 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENT. *** Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Menard, Inc. Motion referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Kerrie) Modified on 9/9/2019 (dmh).
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 *** SEE ENTRY #11 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENT. *** PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Murphy, Kerrie) Modified on 9/6/2019 (dmh).
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Menard, Inc.. (Murphy, Kerrie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Howard Norberg re #3 Answer to Complaint Answer to Defendant's Affirmative Defenses (Schneiderheinze, Michelle)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Schneiderheinze on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schneiderheinze, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Scheduling Conference shall be held on 9/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Counsel outside of Des Moines may attend telephonically. If they choose to do so, counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. Based on the current disputes, the parties shall each file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 9/6/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/13/2019. (imk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Menard, Inc..(Murphy, Kerrie)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet - Defendant Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 9/3/2019. (rmj)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Menard, Inc. from Iowa District Court for Scott County, case number LACE131832. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3890076., filed by Menard, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Kerrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norberg et al v. Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Tomka Bittner
Represented By: Kerrie M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Norberg
Represented By: Michelle Schneiderheinze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Norberg
Represented By: Michelle Schneiderheinze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?