United States of America v. Real Property located at 471 Draper Valley Road, Selma, Oregon et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property located at 471 Draper Valley Road, Selma, Oregon and Real Property located at 1380 Deer Creek Road, Selma, Oregon
Case Number: 3:2019cv00055
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
2 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem (Gaumer, Craig)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Declaration of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Forfeiture Action - Advertisement Cerification Report)(Gaumer, Craig)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER RESCINDING #4 Order. Chief Magistrate Judge Adams' Order 3 shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 9/16/2019. (mem)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 First MOTION to Continue Response Deadline filed by Real Property located at 1380 Deer Creek Road, Selma, Oregon, Real Property located at 471 Draper Valley Road, Selma, Oregon. Answer now due 10/15/2019. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 9/16/2019. (mem)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Continue. Defendants shall file their answer by October 16, 2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/16/2019. (imk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION to Continue Response Deadline by Real Property located at 1380 Deer Creek Road, Selma, Oregon, Real Property located at 471 Draper Valley Road, Selma, Oregon.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 9/27/2019. (Pariente, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Chief Judge John A. Jarvey added. Judge Stephanie M. Rose no longer assigned to case. (don)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified for Forfeiture in Rem against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/4/2019.(Gaumer, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property located at 471 Draper Valley Road, Selma, Oregon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 471 Draper Valley Road, Selma, Oregon
Represented By: Michael D. Pariente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 1380 Deer Creek Road, Selma, Oregon
Represented By: Michael D. Pariente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig P Gaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?