Santiago v. Scott County Court

Plaintiff: Ronald J. Santiago
Defendant: Scott County Attorney's Office and Scott County Court
Case Number: 3:2019cv00056
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (slg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07105. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 9, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to Ronald J. Santiago 3400 Paul Ave. Suite 9D Bronx, NY 10466. (vba)
August 7, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Southern District of Iowa (mro)
August 7, 2019 Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re: #3 Order to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (rjm)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Iowa. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/7/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 7, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm)
July 29, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Scott County Court. Document filed by Ronaldo J. Santiago.(rdz) Modified on 8/6/2019 (rdz).
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 ***MOTION*** REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Ronaldo J. Santiago.(rdz) Modified on 8/6/2019 (rdz). Modified on 8/14/2019 (slg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago v. Scott County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott County Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?