Zabloudil v. City of Davenport, Legal Department, et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Zabloudil
Defendant: John Powell and City of Davenport, Legal Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00066
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 11/21/2019 per Order #4 . (kmc)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, but requiring Plaintiff to amend her Complaint by no later than November 21, 2019. A copy of this Order has been mailed to Plaintiff at 4311 Cheyenne Avenue, #4, Davenport, IA 52806. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 10/22/2019. (jch)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Sealed Document by Teresa Zabloudil submitted to Davenport Clerk's Office on 9/13/19. (jch)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Teresa Zabloudil. (bp)
September 6, 2019 Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. (bp)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Davenport, Legal Department, John Powell, filed by Teresa Zabloudil. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/5/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/5/2019. (bp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zabloudil v. City of Davenport, Legal Department, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Davenport, Legal Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Zabloudil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?