McNeal v. WestRock Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Mercedes McNeal
Defendant: WestRock Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00070
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441wt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by WestRock Services, LLC. (Townsend, Christine)
October 5, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by WestRock Services, LLC.(Townsend, Christine)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 10/28/2019. (kmc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WestRock Services, LLC from Clinton County, IA, case number LACV046143. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3933647., filed by WestRock Services, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Iowa District Court, Clinton County Petition at Law, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit Case Summary)(Townsend, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. WestRock Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes McNeal
Represented By: John F Doak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WestRock Services, LLC
Represented By: Christine E. Bestor Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?