Tomelleri v. Lee Enterprises, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri and Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: Lee Enterprises, Inc. and Lee Enterprises, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00095
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Scheduling Conference shall be held on 3/2/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Counsel outside of Des Moines may attend telephonically. If they choose to do so, counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 2/24/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/10/2020. (imk)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Lee Enterprises, Incorporated.(McIntyre, Joshua)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua James McIntyre on behalf of Lee Enterprises, Incorporated (McIntyre, Joshua)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. Lee Enterprises, Incorporated served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Shaffer, Arthur)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Shaffer, Arthur)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Arthur Shaffer. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/16/2020. (slg)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4033342 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Shaffer, Arthur)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT REGARDING COPYRIGHT mailed to registrar. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (kmc)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.1 Packet) (kmc)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lee Enterprises, Incorporated Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4004567., filed by Joseph R Tomelleri. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 3/12/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/12/2020.(Toomey, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Lee Enterprises, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Enterprises, Incorporated
Represented By: Joshua James McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri
Represented By: William Newman Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: Arthur K. Shaffer
Represented By: William Newman Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?