Doe v. Stephen et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc., Adidas America, Inc., Barnstormers Basketball, Inc. and Gregory Scott Stephen
Case Number: 3:2020cv00005
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Against adidas and granting #7 Motion to Stay Deadlines Applicable to adidas Pending Resolution of adidas's Motion To Compel Arbitration. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 3/4/2020. (mem)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Shawn McLeran terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/20/2020. (mlr)
February 19, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Barnstormers Basketball, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLeran, Michael)
February 18, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY in Support of #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Adidas America, Inc. (Alt, Constance)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dana L. Oxley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/18/2020. (mlr)
February 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc. Notice of Stay and Reservation of Right (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ruling Stay, #2 Exhibit Email, #3 Exhibit Ruling)(Goodman, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/20/2020 Linked to Motions #6 and #7 .(don).
February 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Dana L. Oxley by Adidas America, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 2/28/2020. (Oxley, Dana)
February 11, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by John Doe. Replies due by 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - redacted)(Cook, Guy)
February 11, 2020 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT - DECLARATION OF STANTON R. GALLEGOS WITH EXHIBIT 1 by Adidas America, Inc. re #6 MOTION to Compel. (rav)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Supplement the Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/10/2020. (mlr)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Motion to Supplement by Adidas America, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stanton Gallegos with Exhibit 1 attached)(Alt, Constance)
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Adidas America, Inc.. (Alt, Constance)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File resistance to Defendant Adidas's Motion to Compel Arbitration to February 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/28/2020. (mlr)
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to #6 adidas America, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration by John Doe. Motion referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 2/10/2020. (Cook, Guy)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Barnstormers Basketball, Inc.. (Shaff, Martha)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Barnstormers Basketball, Inc..(Shaff, Martha)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Deadlines Applicable to Adidas Pending Resolution of #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Adidas America, Inc. Motion referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 1/30/2020. (Alt, Constance)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Adidas America, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Stanton Gallegos, #3 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Sponsorship Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2. Prep Hoops Iowa Barnstormers Ink Deal)(Alt, Constance)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendants 1/30/2020. (kjw)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stanton R. Gallegos; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew A. Levin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/15/2020. (slg)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4031975 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Adidas America, Inc.. (Levin, Matthew)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4031953 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Adidas America, Inc.. (Gallegos, Stanton)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Adidas America, Inc. from Iowa District Court for Johnson County, case number LACV 080354. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4026462., filed by Adidas America, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Pleadings Part 1, #2 Exhibit State Pleadings Part 2, #3 Exhibit State Pleadings Part 3, #4 Exhibit State Pleadings Part 4, #5 Exhibit State Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oxley, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Stephen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adidas America, Inc.
Represented By: Constance M Alt
Represented By: Dana L. Oxley
Represented By: Stanton R. Gallegos
Represented By: Matthew A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnstormers Basketball, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Wayne Lobberecht
Represented By: Martha L Shaff
Represented By: Michael Shawn McLeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Scott Stephen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Adam D. Zenor
Represented By: Michael C. Kuehner
Represented By: Michael Darrell Currie
Represented By: Guy R. Cook
Represented By: Laura Nicole Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?