Ocampo v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Cassandra Ocampo
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00033
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Cassandra Ocampo Notice of Service of Discovery to Defendant (Schneiderheinze, Michelle)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER re #8 Order. A Status conference is set for 9:30 a.m. on June 9, 2020. Counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. A Joint Agenda shall be filed by 4:00 p.m. on June 5, 2020. If there are no issues, in the FILED Joint Agenda, counsel may request that the Status Conference be canceled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/28/2020. (mlr)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Three-day Jury Trial set for September 13, 2021, before the Honorable Celeste F. Bremer at the U.S. Courthouse in Davenport, Iowa. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10:00 a.m. on September 1, 2021, before the Honorable Celeste F. Bremer at the U.S. Courthouse in Davenport, Iowa. See Order #8 for instructions to the parties regarding requirements for Final Pretrial Conferences. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/28/2020. (mlr)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting #6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Three-day Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 09:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2021 10:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Status Conference set for 6/9/2020 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731. Initial Disclosures Deadline 5/15/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 8/1/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/1/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/30/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/31/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 1/29/2021. Discovery Deadline 3/31/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 4/30/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/28/2020. (mlr)
April 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer and Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle no longer assigned to case. (bp)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER. Upon the consent of the parties, and in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. section 636 (c), the parties waive their right to proceed before a Judge of the United States District Court and consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct any and all further proceedings and order the entry of judgment in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 4/28/2020. (alb)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Weston, Benjamin)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 REPLY to re #3 Answer to Complaint Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Cassandra Ocampo. (Schneiderheinze, Michelle)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Walmart Inc.. (Weston, Benjamin)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Walmart Inc..(Weston, Benjamin)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 4/10/2020. (rav)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from Iowa District Court in and for Muscatine Co., case number LACV025564. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4093982., filed by Walmart Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.a)(Weston, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocampo v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Ocampo
Represented By: Michelle Schneiderheinze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?