Thomas v. Manpower, Inc
Plaintiff: Andrew G. Thomas
Defendant: Manpower, Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00091
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Manpower, Inc. (Sheffield, Robert)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Manpower, Inc. Responses due by 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A-D)(Sheffield, Robert)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew G. Thomas (rav)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued and Corporate disclosure sent to Andrew G. Thomas at address on docket sheet for service. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Pro se litigants have neither a constitutional nor a statutory right to appointed counsel in civil cases. Plaintiff has not shown that the underlying issues in this case are factually or legally complex and beyond the ability of the plaintiff to investigate and present his claims. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 11/10/2020. (alb)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 11/10/2020. (alb)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT MOTION to Appoint Counsel see entry #1 by Andrew G. Thomas.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (don)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew G Thomas. (bp)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Manpower, Inc, filed by Andrew G Thomas. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/21/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/21/2021. (bp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Manpower, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew G. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpower, Inc
Represented By: Robert A. Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?