United States of America v. $24,020.00 in U.S. Currency, $15,080.00 in U.S. Currency, and $3,380.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $24,020.00 in U.S. Currency, $15,080.00 in U.S. Currency, and $3,380.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Erickah J. Jensen
Case Number: 3:2021cv00027
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT & PROPOSED SCHEDULE: Counsel for the parties shall confer and file by May 14, 2021 a joint status report and proposed schedule for further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/6/2021. (jeb)
May 1, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Erickah J. Jensen.(Johnson, Edward)
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 CLAIM Verified Judicial by Edward David Johnson, III on behalf of Erickah J. Jensen. (Johnson, Edward)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward D. Johnson III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 4/7/2021. (kjw)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Katherine Lyon on behalf of All Defendants (Lyon, Kristina)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4439826 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by $24,020.00 in U.S. Currency, $15,080.00 in U.S. Currency, and $3,380.00 in U.S. Currency. (Johnson, Edward)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 WRIT of Warrant for Arrest in Rem Returned Executed (Gaumer, Craig)
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 Arrest Warrant in Rem Issued as to Defendant property. (kjw)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. Responses due by 3/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaumer, Craig)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified for Forfeiture in Rem against $24,020.00 in U.S. Currency, $15,080.00 in U.S. Currency, and $3,380.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/10/2021.(Gaumer, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $24,020.00 in U.S. Currency, $15,080.00 in U.S. Currency, and $3,380.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $24,020.00 in U.S. Currency, $15,080.00 in U.S. Currency, and $3,380.00 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Kristina Katherine Lyon
Represented By: Edward David Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig P. Gaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Erickah J. Jensen
Represented By: Kristina Katherine Lyon
Represented By: Edward David Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?