Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC v. OSK X, LLC
Plaintiff: Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC
Defendant: OSK X, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Kinseth Hospitality Company, Inc., Leslie Kinseth, Gary Kinseth, Linda Skinner and Bruce Kinseth
Case Number: 3:2021cv00054
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 28 Amended Complaint and Answer to Counterclaim #24 , by Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Y Ltr to OKS re Payoff)(Thompson, Stanley) Modified on 8/13/2021 corrected text (kjw).
August 4, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by OSK X, LLC; Bruce Kinseth waiver served on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021; Gary Kinseth waiver served on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021; Leslie Kinseth waiver served on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021; Kinseth Hospitality Company, Inc. waiver served on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021; Linda Skinner waiver served on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Lange, Lance)
July 23, 2021 Filing 26 Third Party Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw)
July 22, 2021 Filing 25 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Kinseth Hospitality Company, Inc., Leslie Kinseth, Gary Kinseth, Linda Skinner, Bruce Kinseth, filed by OSK X, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Lange, Lance)
July 22, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC by OSK X, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lange, Lance)
July 19, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by OSK X, LLC. (Lange, Lance)
July 7, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC. (Thompson, Stanley)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant has until July 22, 2021 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 7/7/2021. (jeb)
July 6, 2021 Filing 20 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by OSK X, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Lange, Lance)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #11 Defendant's Motion to Strike; and granting #12 Plaintiff's Motion to file overlength brief. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 7/6/2021. (mne)
June 30, 2021 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephanie M. Rose: Motion Hearing held on 6/30/2021 re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC. (Court Reporter Kelli Mulcahy.) (kmc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Defendant's Resistance re #12 MOTION to file overlength brief filed by Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC.(Thompson, Stanley)
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY in Further Support re #11 MOTION to Strike #10 Reply to Response, filed by OSK X, LLC.(Lange, Lance)
June 30, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to file overlength brief filed by OSK X, LLC. Replies due by 7/7/2021.(Lange, Lance)
June 30, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Strike #10 Reply to Response, filed by Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC. Replies due by 7/7/2021.(Thompson, Stanley)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to file overlength brief by Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 7/14/2021. (Thompson, Stanley)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #10 Reply to Response, by OSK X, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 7/14/2021. (Lange, Lance)
June 29, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY Brief re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Bruce Kinseth, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit M, #6 Exhibit N, #7 Exhibit O, #8 Exhibit R, #9 Exhibit S, #10 Exhibit T, #11 Exhibit X)(Thompson, Stanley)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by OSK X, LLC. Replies due by 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of G. Hinojosa, #2 Exhibit 1 to G. Hinojosa Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to G. Hinojosa Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to G. Hinojosa Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to G. Hinojosa Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to G. Hinojosa Declaration)(Lange, Lance)
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Anne Koltookian on behalf of OSK X, LLC (Koltookian, Stephanie)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance W. Lange on behalf of OSK X, LLC (Lange, Lance)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC. OSK X, LLC served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Thompson, Stanley)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing is set for 6/30/2021 at 02:30 PM in Davenport - Room 120 - 1st Floor before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Defendant shall file a Response to Plaintiff's Motion by June 28, 2021. Plaintiff's may file a Reply to Defendant's Response prior to hearing, if so desired. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 6/21/2021. (mkh)
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 ***Filed Incorrectly***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC re #1 Complaint,, served on OSK X, LLC (Thompson, Stanley) Modified on 6/21/2021 attorney to re-file (kjw).
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC. Responses due by 7/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Bruce Kinseth) (kmc)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 7/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Expedited Hearing Requested) against OSK X, LLC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4517853., filed by Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/14/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Statement of Reason Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, #11 Brief in Support, #12 Affidavit Declaration of Bruce Kinseth)(Thompson, Stanley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC v. OSK X, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ankeny Hotel Associates, LLC
Represented By: Stanley J Thompson
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Represented By: Stanley J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSK X, LLC
Represented By: Lance W. Lange
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Koltookian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kinseth Hospitality Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Leslie Kinseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Gary Kinseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Linda Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bruce Kinseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?