Skogman Realty Co. v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Skogman Realty Co. doing business as Skogman Commercial Realty
Defendant: Tailwind Group, Inc., Tailwind College Street IC, LLC and Kyle Smith
Case Number: 3:2021cv00055
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 8/12/2021. (jeb)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 10/17/2022 9:00 AM for estimated 4 days in Davenport Courthouse before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2022 11:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Initial Disclosures due by 8/24/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/8/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 10/8/2021. Plaintiff Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/8/2021. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/7/2022. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/7/2022. Discovery Deadline 4/8/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadline 5/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 8/12/2021. (jeb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 8/11/2021. Attorney Ann Gronlund appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Jeremy Schildcrout appeared for defendants. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 12 minutes. (jeb)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Weinberg, Justin)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held August 11, 2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by August 9, 2021. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 8/3/2021. (jeb)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Skogman Realty Co.. (Gronlund, Ann)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Kyle Smith, Tailwind College Street IC, LLC, Tailwind Group, Inc.. (Schildcrout, Jeremy)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeremy D. Schildcrout. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 7/9/2021. (kjw)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4536922 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Kyle Smith, Tailwind College Street IC, LLC, Tailwind Group, Inc.. (Schildcrout, Jeremy)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Kyle Smith, Tailwind College Street IC, LLC, Tailwind Group, Inc..(Weinberg, Justin)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 7/16/2021. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 7/16/2021. (kjw)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tailwind College Street IC, LLC, Tailwind Group, Inc., Kyle Smith from Iowa District Court in and for Johnson County, case number LACV082560. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4526156., filed by Tailwind College Street IC, LLC, Tailwind Group, Inc., Kyle Smith. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit Notice to the State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Weinberg, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skogman Realty Co. v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tailwind Group, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Peter Weinberg
Represented By: Jeremy David Schildcrout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tailwind College Street IC, LLC
Represented By: Justin Peter Weinberg
Represented By: Jeremy David Schildcrout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Smith
Represented By: Justin Peter Weinberg
Represented By: Jeremy David Schildcrout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skogman Realty Co. doing business as Skogman Commercial Realty
Represented By: Brad J. Brady
Represented By: Matthew L. Preston
Represented By: Ann Christine Gronlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?