N.C. Veterinary Services, P.C. v. Kay Metzgar et al
Plaintiff: N.C. Veterinary Services, P.C. doing business as Kimberly Pines Veterinary Hospital
Defendant: Kay Metzgar, Kay Marlene Fix and Precious Paws Veterinary Hospital, P.L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00066
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 bc
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. Telephonic Status Conferences set for 12/13/2021, 2/15/2022, 4/12/2022, and 6/13/2022 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/17/2021. (k)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement) (k)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER adopting as modified at the Scheduling Conference #12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 10/8/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 1/10/2022. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/10/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/10/2022. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/11/2022. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 4/14/2022. Discovery Deadline 6/13/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadline 7/13/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2023 10:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 4/24/2023 09:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt. Estimated length: 5 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/17/2021. (k)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/17/2021. Attorneys Randall D. Armentrout and Lynn C. Herndon appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Maegan Marie Gorham appeared for Defendants. Status of the case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 16 minutes. (k)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Armentrout, Randall)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by N.C. Veterinary Services, P.C. Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel for Plaintiff (Hardin, Daniel)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Kay Metzgar, Precious Paws Veterinary Hospital, P.L.L.C.. (Gorham, Maegan)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by N.C. Veterinary Services, P.C.. (Armentrout, Randall)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn C. Herndon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Herndon, Lynn)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall D. Armentrout on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Armentrout, Randall)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 9/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The Parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided in L.R. 16 by 9/10/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/9/2021. (bam)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Kay Metzgar, Precious Paws Veterinary Hospital, P.L.L.C..(Gorham, Maegan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Packet. Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 8/25/2021. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 9/3/2021. (bp)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants may have to and including 8/9/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to [1-1] Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/3/2021. (bam)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kay Metzgar a/k/a Kay Marlene Fix, D.V.M., Precious Paws Veterinary Hospital, P.L.L.C..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Attachments: #1 7-27-21 Email Communication)(Gorham, Maegan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kay Metzgar a/k/a Kay Marlene Fix, D.V.M., Precious Paws Veterinary Hospital, P.L.L.C. from Iowa District Court for Scott County, case number LACE 134011. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4562184., filed by Kay Metzgar a/k/a Kay Marlene Fix, D.V.M., Precious Paws Veterinary Hospital, P.L.L.C.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 State Filing_PLTF Orig Notice_Petition, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal_State)(Gorham, Maegan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.C. Veterinary Services, P.C. v. Kay Metzgar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Metzgar
Represented By: Maegan Marie Gorham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Marlene Fix
Represented By: Maegan Marie Gorham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precious Paws Veterinary Hospital, P.L.L.C.
Represented By: Maegan Marie Gorham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.C. Veterinary Services, P.C. doing business as Kimberly Pines Veterinary Hospital
Represented By: Daniel Fletcher Hardin
Represented By: Randall D. Armentrout
Represented By: Lynn C. Herndon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?