Staggers v. Timmerman
Petitioner: Dustin Lee Staggers
Respondent: Tori Ann Timmerman
Case Number: 3:2023cv00083
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 11601 International Child Abduction Remedies Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Final Pretrial Order Form) (jeb)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2024 2:00 PM in Davenport Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Bench Trial set to begin 3/4/2024 9:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Trial set to last 3 days. See order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/8/2024. (jeb)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER Referring for Report and Recommendation #5 Amended Verified Petition for Return of Child to Mexico and for Issuance of Show Cause Order filed by Dustin Lee Staggers. The Amended Petition is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson Jr. for a report and recommendation. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 1/4/2024. (mkh)
December 22, 2023 Filing 21 STIPULATION by Dustin Lee Staggers. (Schaffer, David)
December 21, 2023 Filing 20 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Tori Ann Timmerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Joseph, Anthony)
December 20, 2023 Filing 19 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/20/2023. Attorneys Diana Miller, David Schaffer & Sydnee Waggoner appeared for petitioner. Attorney Anthony Joseph appeared for respondent. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 47 minutes. (jeb)
December 20, 2023 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Tori Ann Timmerman. (Joseph, Anthony)
December 18, 2023 Filing 17 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Schaffer, David)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held December 20, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/14/2023. (jeb)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Petitioner's Expedited Motion for Status and Scheduling Conference. Counsel for the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed Rule 16 scheduling order and discovery plan utilizing the Clerk of Court's form as applicable to this particular case. Instead of a trial ready date, counsel shall provide the court multiple options with dates the parties are available for the setting of trial. The proposed scheduling order and discovery plan must be filed jointly by no later than 5:00 p.m. on December 18, 2023. A scheduling conference will be set in a separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/14/2023. (jeb)
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 First MOTION to Expedite FOR STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Dustin Lee Staggers.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 12/27/2023. (Waggoner, Sydnee)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose: Telephonic Status Conference with counsel as to Staggers v. Timmerman held on 12/7/2023. Attorney Anthony Joseph and Kimberley Baer appeared on behalf of respondent Timmerman and Attorney Diana Miller, David Schaffer, and Sydnee Waggoner appeared on behalf of petitioner Staggers. Status of Case Discussed. Time in Court: 11 Minutes. Status Conference held on 12/7/2023. (Court Reporter Kelli Mulcahy.) (mkh)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony Joseph, I; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Erin Masters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 12/7/2023. (nla)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5315000 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Tori Ann Timmerman. (Masters, Erin)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5314976 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Tori Ann Timmerman. (Joseph, Anthony)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberley K. Baer on behalf of Tori Ann Timmerman (Baer, Kimberley)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Lee Staggers. Tori Ann Timmerman served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Waggoner, Sydnee)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting expedited Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2023 01:15 PM in Phone Hearing(SMR). Counsel shall call 1-888-808-6929 and enter code 2486346. Hearing will be held before Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose. See Order for important service deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 12/4/2023. (mne) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/4/2023) (mne).
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Lee Staggers. Tori Ann Timmerman served on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023. (Waggoner, Sydnee)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tori Ann Timmerman., filed by Dustin Lee Staggers. (Attachments: #1 Show Cause Order)(Schaffer, David)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David N. Schaffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 11/29/2023. (btg)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5307261 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Dustin Lee Staggers. (Schaffer, David)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (btg)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tori Ann Timmerman Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number AIASDC-5306808., filed by Dustin Lee Staggers. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/26/2024. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waggoner, Sydnee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staggers v. Timmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dustin Lee Staggers
Represented By: Diana L. Miller
Represented By: David N. Schaffer
Represented By: Sydnee Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tori Ann Timmerman
Represented By: Kimberley K. Baer
Represented By: Anthony Joseph, I
Represented By: Erin Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?