United States of America v. Tyler
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Brian Tyler and Brian R. Tyler
Case Number: 3:2024cv00020
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: William P Kelly
2 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2024 Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable FPTO) (amp)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. Telephonic Status Conferences set for 10:00 AM on 8/22/2024 and 10/24/2024 before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Parties shall file a status report in accordance with this order at least 2 business days prior to each status conference. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/25/2024. (amp)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting #6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 4/29/2024. Motions to Add Parties due by 5/31/2024. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/31/2024. Discovery Deadline 9/30/2024. Dispositive Motion Deadline 12/2/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2025 at 10:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Bench Trial set for 6/9/2025 at 09:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Estimated length: 2 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/25/2024. (amp)
April 25, 2024 Filing 9 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/25/2024. Attorney Franke appeared on behalf of plaintiff. Attorney Monroe appeared on behalf of defendant. Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 8 minutes. (amp)
April 22, 2024 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER RESETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 4/25/2024 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Attorney Monroe shall attend. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/22/2024. (amp)
April 22, 2024 Filing 7 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference attempted on 4/22/2024. Attorney Franke appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Monroe was not in attendance. Order resetting the scheduling conference to follow. Total Court Time: 7 minutes. (amp)
April 15, 2024 Filing 6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Franke, Ryan)
April 3, 2024 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 4/22/2024 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 4/15/2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/3/2024. (amp)
March 27, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Brian R. Tyler.(Monroe, James)
March 11, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Brian R. Tyler served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. (Franke, Ryan)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons, if applicable, in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (sml)
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Tyler, filed by United States. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/28/2024.(Franke, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Ryan Franke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ryan Franke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian R. Tyler
Represented By: James R Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?