Williams Distributing Co. v. Southridge Senior Lofts, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Williams Distributing Co.
Defendant: Southridge Senior Lofts, LLC and Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00259
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Office: Central Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332rp
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sjc)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Williams Distributing Co. (Stone, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to Motion to Dismiss to and including October 4, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/28/2018. (mlr)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Williams Distributing Co..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 10/11/2018. (Stone, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Southridge Senior Lofts, LLC. Responses due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Beaman, Bradley)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Williams Distributing Co.. Hartford Fire Insurance Company served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Stone, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Williams Distributing Co.. Southridge Senior Lofts, LLC served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Stone, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Williams Distributing Co.. (Stone, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Summons and corporate disclosure packet emailed to counsel. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 9/13/2018. (sjc)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3566461., filed by Williams Distributing Co.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/8/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Stone, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams Distributing Co. v. Southridge Senior Lofts, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams Distributing Co.
Represented By: Jeffrey A Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southridge Senior Lofts, LLC
Represented By: Bradley M Beaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley M Beaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?