Newberry v. Wole et al

Plaintiff: Larry E. Newberry
Defendant: County of Barbersville, W. VA., Department of Corrections for W. VA., State of West Virginia and Kim Wole
Case Number: 4:2018cv00301
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Larry E. Newberry which included #1 Complaint (NEF). (kjw)
September 25, 2018 6 Clerk's Letter to plaintiff regarding transfer of case. (kjw)
September 25, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. Transferred case to the Northern District of West Virginia, case #3-18-cv-154. (don)
September 24, 2018 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Larry E. Newberry, resent NEF for entry #1 (don)
September 24, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER Transferring Case. The Clerk of Court for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Iowa shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 9/24/2018. Copy of Order mailed to pro se Plaintiff by Chambers. (hfh)
September 24, 2018 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Larry Newberry which included #1 Complaint (don)
September 12, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry E. Newberry. (krn)
September 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against County of Barbersville, W. VA., Department of Corrections for W. VA., State of West Virginia, Kim Wole, filed by Larry E. Newberry. (krn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newberry v. Wole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry E. Newberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Barbersville, W. VA.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections for W. VA.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Wole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?