McFadden et al v. Massage Heights Franchising, LLC

Plaintiff: Relax Investments, LLC and Trisha McFadden
Defendant: Massage Heights Franchising, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00302
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
1 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
2 Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. (don)
October 5, 2018 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trisha McFadden, Relax Investments, LLC (Carroll, Michael)
September 21, 2018 6 MOTION to Dismiss and for Other Relief by Massage Heights Franchising, LLC. Responses due by 10/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Ex. A, Notice of AAA Hearing)(Ternavska, Daryna)
September 21, 2018 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger added. Judge Stephanie M. Rose no longer assigned to case. (don)
September 20, 2018 5 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting #4 defendant's consent motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' petition. Defendant shall have to and including 9/26/2018 to move or plead in response to plaintiffs' removed petition. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters (R) on 9/20/2018.(kln)
September 19, 2018 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Petition by Massage Heights Franchising, LLC.Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 10/3/2018. (Ternavska, Daryna)
September 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 10/7/2018. Emailed packet to plaintiff's counsel. (don)
September 12, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Massage Heights Franchising, LLC. (Ternavska, Daryna)
September 12, 2018 2 NOTICE by Massage Heights Franchising, LLC re: Service of Copy of #1 Notice of Removal on Plaintiffs' Counsel and State Court (Ternavska, Daryna)
September 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Massage Heights Franchising, LLC from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number VCV056818. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3594666., filed by Massage Heights Franchising, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, Def.s AAA Claims, #2 Ex. 2, Pls. AAA Counterclaims, #3 Ex. 3, Def.s AAA Answer to Counterclaims, #4 Ex. 4, Pls. State Petition and Exhibits, #5 Ex. 5, Pls. State Affidavit of Service)(Ternavska, Daryna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFadden et al v. Massage Heights Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massage Heights Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Ross W Johnson
Represented By: Daryna Ternavska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Relax Investments, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha McFadden
Represented By: Michael J. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?