Peoples v. Loffredo Gardens, Inc.

Plaintiff: Derrick Peoples
Defendant: Loffredo Gardens, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00305
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
1 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2018 10 Featured Case TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference shall be held on November 14, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in the United States Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa, before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/25/2018. (jeb)
October 25, 2018 9 Featured Case TEXT ORDER RE FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL: Any party seeking to file any documents under seal in this case first must file a motion requesting leave to do so. The documents sought to be filed under seal must not be attached to the motion or they will become part of the public case docket. Instead, the documents and purported confidential information therein must be described in the motion with sufficient particularity to enable the court to rule on the motion without reviewing the documents and determine whether public access should be prohibited. Leave to file under seal will be limited to only those specific documents or portions which purportedly disclose confidential information. Reasonable efforts must be made to redact such information to allow public filing of documents. Counsel for the moving party must confer in good faith with counsel for all other parties and state whether or not the other parties agree with sealing the documents and consent to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/25/2018. (jeb)
October 25, 2018 8 Featured Case JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER as modified by Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/25/2018. (jeb)
October 25, 2018 7 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Joint Protective Order. The court approves and will enter a protective order in the form submitted by the parties with the exception of paragraph 12 which has been deleted and paragraph 15 which has been modified as indicated. A separate order will be entered which addresses the filing of documents under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/25/2018. (jeb)
October 23, 2018 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason S Rieper (Rieper, Jason)
October 22, 2018 5 MOTION for Protective Order by Loffredo Gardens, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Joint Protective Order)(Bauer, Erika)
October 22, 2018 4 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Bauer, Erika)
September 27, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Loffredo Gardens, Inc.. (Bauer, Erika)
September 20, 2018 2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Loffredo Gardens, Inc..(Bauer, Erika)
September 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 10/15/2018. (kmc)
September 13, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Loffredo Gardens, Inc. from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL142024. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3595986., filed by Loffredo Gardens, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Rule 81.1 Certificate)(Bertrand, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoples v. Loffredo Gardens, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Peoples
Represented By: Jason S Rieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loffredo Gardens, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R Reck
Represented By: Kelsey J Knowles
Represented By: Erika Lauren Bertrand
Represented By: Erika Lauren Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?