Ryan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Roy D. Ryan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2018cv00313
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 10/1/2018. (alb)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward A. Wicklund. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 9/25/2018. (kjw)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3604219 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Roy D. Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, N.Y.)(Kappelman, Wes)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roy D. Ryan. (Kappelman, Wes)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Roy D. Ryan. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AC Denial of Review)(Kappelman, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy D. Ryan
Represented By: Wes Lance Kappelman
Represented By: Edward Allen Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?