Kline et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sharon M. Kline and Alan H. Kline
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00362
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Delta Air Lines, Inc.., filed by Alan H. Kline and Sharon M. Kline. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (slg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alan H. Kline, Sharon M. Kline; Delta Air Lines, Inc. waiver served on 10/26/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (slg)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Right to Sue by Alan H. Kline, Sharon M. Kline (slg)
October 26, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number IAS400020469 by Alan H. Kline, Sharon M. Kline (kjw)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Alan H. Kline, filed by Alan H. Kline, SHaron M. Kline. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/24/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/24/2019. (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kline et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon M. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan H. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?