Fiebelkorn v. Grinnell State Bank et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Fiebelkorn
Defendant: Rusty Jones, Grinnell State Bank, Murphy Alison and Alison Murphy
Case Number: 4:2018cv00366
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441ada
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Grinnell State Bank, Rusty Jones, Alison Murphy.(Samuelson, Jaki)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against Grinnell State Bank, Alison Murphy and Rusty Jones filed by Jennifer Fiebelkorn. (dmh)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's unresisted Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/20/2018. (krp)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND by Jennifer Fiebelkorn.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand)(Judkins, Whitney)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY DEMAND by Grinnell State Bank, Rusty Jones, Alison Murphy.(Samuelson, Jaki)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Grinnell State Bank, Rusty Jones, Alison Murphy. (Warner, Alexis)
October 31, 2018 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant, Grinnell State Bank due on or before 11/29/2018. (bp)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Grinnell State Bank, Murphy Alison, Rusty Jones from Poweshiek County, case number LALA002432. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3636519., filed by Grinnell State Bank, Murphy Alison, Rusty Jones. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings)(Warner, Alexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiebelkorn v. Grinnell State Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty Jones
Represented By: Jaki K Samuelson
Represented By: Alexis Lynee Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell State Bank
Represented By: Jaki K Samuelson
Represented By: Alexis Lynee Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Alison
Represented By: Jaki K Samuelson
Represented By: Alexis Lynee Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Murphy
Represented By: Jaki K Samuelson
Represented By: Alexis Lynee Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Fiebelkorn
Represented By: Brooke C Timmer
Represented By: Whitney C. Judkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?