Xenia Rural Water District v. City of Johnston, Iowa

Plaintiff: Xenia Rural Water District
Defendant: City of Johnston, Iowa
Case Number: 4:2018cv00431
Filed: November 3, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: James E Gritzner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 07:1926
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 11 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM , and Jury Demand against Xenia Rural Water District by City of Johnston, Iowa.(Miller, William)
November 29, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Adolfo Cornell on behalf of City of Johnston, Iowa (Cornell, Manuel)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer City of Johnston, Iowa answer due 12/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/27/2018. (krp)
November 26, 2018 8 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by City of Johnston, Iowa.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Miller, William)
November 26, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Miller on behalf of City of Johnston, Iowa (Miller, William)
November 7, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xenia Rural Water District. City of Johnston, Iowa served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Smith, Frank)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven Massey Harris; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Dwight Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/6/2018. (kjw)
November 6, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3643682 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Xenia Rural Water District. (Davis, Michael)
November 6, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3643671 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Xenia Rural Water District. (Harris, Steven)
November 5, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Xenia Rural Water District. (Smith, Frank)
November 3, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3641078., filed by Xenia Rural Water District. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/1/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/1/2019. (Smith, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xenia Rural Water District v. City of Johnston, Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Johnston, Iowa
Represented By: William J Miller
Represented By: Manuel Adolfo Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xenia Rural Water District
Represented By: Frank Murray Smith
Represented By: Michael Dwight Davis
Represented By: Steven Massey Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?