Agrifund, LLC v. Heartland Co-op

Plaintiff: Agrifund, LLC.
Defendant: Heartland Co-op
Case Number: 4:2018cv00439
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Helen C Adams
1 Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An In-Person Scheduling Conference shall be held on 1/14/2019 at 9:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in the Des Moines Courthouse - Room 420 - 4th Floor. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 1/9/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/10/2018. (imk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Heartland Co-op.(Courter, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina M Stanger on behalf of Heartland Co-op (Stanger, Kristina)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Agrifund, LLC.. (Knickrehm, Craig)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Heartland Co-op., filed by Agrifund, LLC..(Knickrehm, Craig)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W Courter on behalf of Heartland Co-op (Courter, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 plaintiff's motion to extend the deadline to file amended complaint. Plaintiff may have to and including 11/30/2018 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/21/2018. (k)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Agrifund, LLC..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 12/5/2018. (Knickrehm, Craig)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER re Diversity Jurisdiction and Citizenship of Parties in #1 Complaint, filed by Agrifund, LLC.. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 11/13/2018. (jc)
November 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 11/30/2018. (kjw)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heartland Co-op Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3647218., filed by AGRIFUND, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/7/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Knickrehm, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agrifund, LLC v. Heartland Co-op
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Co-op
Represented By: Kristina M Stanger
Represented By: Jeffrey W Courter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agrifund, LLC.
Represented By: Craig A Knickrehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?