Emrit v. Reynolds

Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Kim Reynolds
Case Number: 4:2018cv00440
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Helen C Adams
1 Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2018 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail (Blank Summons for service) sent to Ronald Satish Emrit (don)
November 21, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Ronald Satish Emrit. (kjw)
November 20, 2018 4 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 11/20/2018. (alb)
November 13, 2018 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ronald Emrit which included #1 Complaint. (kjw)
November 9, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Satish Emrit. (kjw)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Kim Reynolds, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/7/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?