Doe v. Iowa Health System

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Iowa Health System
Case Number: 4:2018cv00453
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 the parties' Consent Motion to Stay deadlines in this case. If the Court denies the pending Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (ECF 7), the Defendant is granted an extension of time to file its Responsive Pleadings; these shall be filed within thirty days after the ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. If Responsive Pleadings are filed, the Court will determine when to set a FRCP 16(b) status conference to discuss pretrial deadlines, and a schedule for submission of the Motion for Class Certification. At this time, the parties are not required to submit a Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by U. S. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/24/2019. (CFB) (Bremer, Celeste)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Pending Defendant UnityPoint Health's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer by Iowa Health System.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 2/5/2019. (Collignon, Casie)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint or in the Alternative Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 or in the Alternative Stay by Iowa Health System. Responses due by 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Fox Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Fox Original Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Fox Defendants Original Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit D - Fox First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Fox Second Motion to Dismiss Briefing, #7 Exhibit F - Fox Joint Discovery Plan, #8 Exhibit G - Fox Motion for Limited Discovery)(Collignon, Casie)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Casie D. Collignon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/20/2018. (slg)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3681567 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Iowa Health System. (Collignon, Casie)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Iowa Health System answer due 1/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/18/2018. (mlr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Iowa Health System.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Roach, Benjamin)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Iowa Health System served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Galligan, Brian)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION PETITION against Iowa Health System Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3658201., filed by Jane Doe. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/25/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/25/2019.(Galligan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Iowa Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Brian P Galligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Health System
Represented By: Casie Dell Collignon
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?