Burress v. PJ Food Service Inc.
Plaintiff: William W Burress and William W. Burress
Defendant: PJ Food Service Inc. and Papa John
Case Number: 4:2018cv00462
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: James E Gritzner
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 2/4/2019. (jeb)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 6/15/2020 9:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Senior Judge James E. Gritzner. Estimated length 5 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Initial Disclosures due by 2/8/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 3/1/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/1/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/26/2019. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 6/21/2019. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/19/2019. Discovery Deadline 9/30/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadline 11/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 2/4/2019. (jeb)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/31/2019. Attorney Ron Danks appeared for plaintiff. Attorneys Justin Dean, Anne Hershewe & Patrick Martin appeared for defendants. Scheduling order to be entered. Total Court Time: 15 minutes. (jeb)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER RESCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: Because the Courthouse will be closed on January 30, 2019 due to inclement weather, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on January 31, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/29/2019. (jeb)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Dean, Justin)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on January 30, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by January 25, 2019. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/15/2019. (jeb)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by PJ Food Service Inc.. (Dean, Justin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (D's Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Petition at Law) by PJ Food Service Inc..(Dean, Justin)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Justin M. Dean; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anne L. Hershewe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 12/12/2018. (kjw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3674570 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by PJ Food Service Inc.. (Hershewe, Anne)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3674452 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by PJ Food Service Inc.. (Dean, Justin)
December 11, 2018 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 1/10/2019. (vr)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PJ Food Service Inc. from Polk County District Court, case number CVCV057286. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3671977., filed by PJ Food Service Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - List of Matters Pending, #4 Exhibit D - List of Counsel, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burress v. PJ Food Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PJ Food Service Inc.
Represented By: Patrick R. Martin
Represented By: Justin M. Dean
Represented By: Anne L. Hershewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John
Represented By: Patrick R. Martin
Represented By: Justin M. Dean
Represented By: Anne L. Hershewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William W Burress
Represented By: Carly Rae Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William W. Burress
Represented By: Carly Rae Smith
Represented By: Ron Danks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?