Berg v. INTL FC Stone, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anne M. Berg
Defendant: INTL FC Stone, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00465
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File under Seal by INTL FC Stone, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 2/25/2019. (Hulett, Debra)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 2/6/2019. (hfh)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Defendant's Resistance re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Anne M. Berg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Anne Berg)(Paschke, Kellie)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER Granting #5 Defendant's Motion to Stay Deadline to Move or Plead. The deadline to move or plead is stayed until 7 days after the Court rules on #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 1/24/2019. (hfh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by INTL FC Stone, Inc.. Replies due by 1/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James Richey, #2 Affidavit of Debra Hulett)(Hulett, Debra)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Unresisted MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by INTL FC Stone, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 2/7/2019. (Stefani, Ryan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anne M. Berg.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(Paschke, Kellie)
December 28, 2018 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 1/14/2019. (bp)
December 17, 2018 Reset Deadlines: INTL FC Stone, Inc. answer due 1/25/2019. (bp)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/14/2018. (imk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Move or Plead by INTL FC Stone, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 12/28/2018. (Hulett, Debra)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INTL FC Stone, Inc. from Iowa District Court for Dallas County, case number LACV041449. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3676645., filed by INTL FC Stone, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Statement of Reason Rule 81(a))(Hulett, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg v. INTL FC Stone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne M. Berg
Represented By: Kellie Lynne Paschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTL FC Stone, Inc.
Represented By: Debra Hulett
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Stefani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?