United States of America v. $3,560.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $3,560.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 4:2019cv00013
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Declaration of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Forfeiture Action - Advertisement Certification Report)(Gaumer, Craig)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Verified for Forfeiture in Rem (Gaumer, Craig)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America re #3 Writ Issued Executed Warrant of Arrest in Rem (Gaumer, Craig)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant Issued to United States Marshal or any other United States officer or employee duly authorized. Signed by Clerk of Court John S. Courter on January 14, 2019. (kmc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. Responses due by 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaumer, Craig)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified for Forfeiture in Rem against $3,560.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/8/2019.(Gaumer, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $3,560.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,560.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig P Gaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?