Kline et al v. DAL Global Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Sharon M. Kline and Alan H. Kline
Defendant: DAL Global Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00015
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
2 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
3 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (slg)
February 13, 2019 Cases associated: Create association to 4:18-cv-00362-JAJ-SBJ. (slg)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion to Dismiss; granting #10 , #11 Motions to Dismiss. Case Nos. 4:18cv0362 and 4:19cv0015 are hereby consolidated for all further purposes. All future filings shall be made in Case No. 4:18cv0362. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 2/12/2019. (mem)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: A Status Conference shall be held on February 21, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in the United States Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The conference will be held concurrently with the scheduling conference for Case No. 4:18-cv-00362-JAJ-SBJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 2/11/2019. (jeb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT 3 ONLY without Prejudice by Sharon M. Kline. Responses due by 2/19/2019. (Stoltze, John)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Alan H. Kline by Alan H. Kline. Responses due by 2/19/2019. (Stoltze, John)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 ***REQUEST to consolidate with case 4-18-cv-362*** and RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alan H. Kline, Sharon M. Kline. Replies due by 2/11/2019.(Stoltze, John) Modified on 2/5/2019 (don).
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall have until February 4, 2019, to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #4 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/28/2019. (jeb)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by Alan H. Kline, Sharon M. Kline.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 2/11/2019. (Stoltze, John)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Quentin Stoltze on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stoltze, John)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Adolfo Cornell on behalf of DAL Global Services, LLC (Cornell, Manuel)
January 15, 2019 Chief Judge John A. Jarvey and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams and Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by DAL Global Services, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Miller, William)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by DAL Global Services, LLC. (Miller, William)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81(a) by DAL Global Services, LLC. (Miller, William)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DAL Global Services, LLC from District Court for Polk County, case number LACL 142859. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3699640., filed by DAL Global Services, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Miller, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kline et al v. DAL Global Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAL Global Services, LLC
Represented By: William J Miller
Represented By: Manuel Adolfo Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon M. Kline
Represented By: John Quentin Stoltze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan H. Kline
Represented By: John Quentin Stoltze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?