Kuempel v. Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield

Plaintiff: Kathy Kuempel
Defendant: Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Dakota and Wellmark Blue Cross Blue Shield
Case Number: 4:2019cv00020
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 3/14/2019. (klw)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand by Wellmark Blue Cross Blue Shield.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 3/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Thrall, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Wellmark Blue Cross Blue Shield.(Thrall, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wellmark Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Thrall, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wellmark Blue Cross Blue Shield answer due 3/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/19/2019. (mlr)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wellmark Blue Cross Blue Shield.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Thrall, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Kathy Kuempel re #3 Amended Complaint (Pechota, Dominic)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. All Defendants., filed by Kathy Kuempel.(Pechota, Dominic)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Dakota. Responses due by 2/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Thrall, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 2/21/2019. (vr)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Dakota from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL143140. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3705360., filed by Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Dakota. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Statement of Reason)(Thrall, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuempel v. Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Kuempel
Represented By: Nicholas C. Rowley
Represented By: Dominic F Pechota
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Dakota
Represented By: Michael W Thrall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark Blue Cross Blue Shield
Represented By: Michael W Thrall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?