Maxwell v. Madison County, et al

Plaintiff: Brian Maxwell
Defendant: Jason Barnes, Jim Ascione and Madison County
Case Number: 4:2019cv00051
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. Status Conference set for 6/19/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 8/16/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 10/21/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 12/20/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 2/20/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 4/21/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 6/22/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 8/28/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/18/2019. (imk)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENT. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/18/2019. (imk)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #4 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 3/29/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 5/31/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/1/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/13/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/13/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 12/16/2019. Discovery Deadline 3/2/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 5/11/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 420 - 4th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Estimated length of five days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/18/2019. (imk)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 3/18/2019. Attorney Jeffrey Tronvold appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Barbara Hering appeared for defendants. Status of case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 14 minutes. (imk)
March 18, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added as presider. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams and Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger no longer assigned to case. (vr)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER OF REFERENCE - CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE pursuant to #4 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate. This matter is hereby referred to a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings and entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and the consent of the parties. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 3/15/2019. (hfh)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Tronvold, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Scheduling Conference shall be held on 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Counsel outside of Des Moines may appear telephonically, and should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 3/13/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/21/2019. (imk)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jim Ascione, Jason Barnes, Madison County.(Hering, Barbara)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jim Ascione, Madison County, Jason Barnes from Madison County, case number LACV034907. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3732390., filed by Jim Ascione, Madison County, Jason Barnes. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/14/2019.(Hering, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. Madison County, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Barnes
Represented By: Barbara A Hering
Represented By: Michelle R. Rodemyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Ascione
Represented By: Barbara A Hering
Represented By: Michelle R. Rodemyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County
Represented By: Barbara A Hering
Represented By: Michelle R. Rodemyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Maxwell
Represented By: Jeffrey R Tronvold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?