White v. U. S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Robin White
Defendant: Wisconsin Physicians Service Government Health Administrators, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United Healthcare Services Incorporated and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 4:2019cv00055
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robin White; Wisconsin Physicians Service Government Health Administrators waiver served on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (slg)
April 9, 2019 Set Deadlines: Waiver of Service due by 4/30/2019. (mem)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss for Ineffective Service of Process. The plaintiff shall have until 4/30/2019 to make a proper request for waiver of service of process pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(d)(1). Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 4/9/2019. (mem)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Robin White dismissing party United Healthcare Services Incorporated with prejudice. (don)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 2nd SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin White. United Healthcare Services Incorporated served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (don)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Ineffective Service of Process filed by Wisconsin Physicians Service Government Health Administrators.(Logan, Holly)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 RESISTANCE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Ineffective Service of Process filed by Robin White. Replies due by 3/26/2019. (slg)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 Errata Certificate of Service to Pro Se Plaintiff re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Wisconsin Physicians Service Government Health Administrators. (Logan, Holly)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Ineffective Service of Process by Wisconsin Physicians Service Government Health Administrators. Responses due by 3/29/2019. (Logan, Holly)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin White. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (don)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin White. United States Department of Justice(Attorney for the Southern District of Iowa) served on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (don)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin White. United States Department of Justice served on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (don)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin White. United Healthcare Services Incorporated served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (don)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin White. Wisconsin Physicians Service Government Health Administrators served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (don)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Mailed summons to pro se plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 DOJ IASD, #2 DOJ, #3 United Healthcare, #4 Wisconsin) (don)
February 19, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number IAS400020914 for Filing Fee by Robin White. (slg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robin White. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/20/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/20/2019. (don) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #1 Notice) (don).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. U. S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Physicians Service Government Health Administrators
Represented By: Holly M Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?