Wells Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc. v. Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P.
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc. and Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc
Defendant: Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00059
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #3 Motion to transfer case. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 4/10/2019. (alb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle: Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2019 re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District filed by Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P., and #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P. (Court Reporter Linda Egbers.) (mel)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Attorneys Mahendru and Braun may join the hearing on 4/10/19 at 11:30 a.m. by using these numbers: Toll Free Number: 1-888-636-3807 Access Code: 5261674. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 4/3/2019. (alb)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P. re #12 Order, Defendant's Notice of Request to Appear by Telephone for April 10, 2019 Hearing (Mahendru, Ashish)
April 2, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: In Court Hearing set for 4/10/2019 11:30 AM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. (alb)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER. Hearing on the pending motions to dismiss (Docket #2) and to transfer (Docket #3) will be held at 11:30 a.m. on April 10, 2019 in Courtroom #455 at the U.S. Courthouse in Des Moines, IA. Counsel wishing to participate in the hearing by telephone call shall so inform the court prior to the hearing. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 4/2/2019. (alb)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY In Support of Motion to Transfer Venue re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District filed by Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P..(Mahendru, Ashish)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P.. (Mahendru, Ashish)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District filed by Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc. Replies due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ryan Forret)(Thiel, Abigail)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc. Replies due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ryan Forret)(Thiel, Abigail)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc. (Thiel, Abigail)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ashish Mahendru; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Darren A. Braun. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/8/2019. (kjw)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3758010 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P.. (Braun, Darren)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3757990 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P.. (Mahendru, Ashish)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District by Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P.. Responses due by 3/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dr. Huong Le, #3 Exhibit B - Seamless Solutions articles of incorporation, #4 Exhibit C - Leases, #5 Exhibit D - LinkedIn profile)(Long, Scott)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P.. Responses due by 3/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dr. Huong Le, #3 Exhibit B - Seamless Solutions articles of incorporation, #4 Exhibit C - Leases)(Long, Scott)
February 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for 3/22/2019. 7.1 packet emailed to counsel. (sjc)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P. from Polk County, Iowa District Court, case number LACL143082. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3739346., filed by Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 81.a)(Long, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc. v. Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Stacie M Codr
Represented By: Abigail Legg Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc
Represented By: Stacie M Codr
Represented By: Abigail Legg Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Real Estate Investments, L.L.P.
Represented By: Scott L Long
Represented By: Ashish Mahendru
Represented By: Darren A. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?