Hennings v. State of Iowa

Plaintiff: Mark Thomas Hennings
Defendant: State of Iowa
Interested Party: William A Hill
Case Number: 4:2019cv00079
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of USCA to submit documents as to #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Thomas Hennings. (vr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 USCA Case Number 19-2271 for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Thomas Hennings. (vr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA Supplement by District Court Clerk to USCA re #8 Notice of Appeal filed on 5/15/2019. (vr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order, #7 Judgment by Mark Thomas Hennings. (slg)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT in favor of State of Iowa against Mark Thomas Hennings. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 4/30/2019. (kmc)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and close this matter. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 4/30/2019. (jch)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 4/29/2019. (jch)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Mark Thomas Hennings.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 4/22/2019. (kjw)
March 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/26/2019. (kjw)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, because Plaintiff has failed to state a claim on which relief can be granted, his Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Plaintiff has until April 26, 2019, to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 3/27/2019. (jch)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Thomas Hennings. (slg)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Iowa, filed by Mark Thomas Hennings. (slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hennings v. State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William A Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Thomas Hennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?