Hydro-Klean, LLC v. Central Power Washing, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Hydro-Klean, LLC
Defendant: Central Power Washing, L.L.C. and Joseph Thomas
Case Number: 4:2019cv00085
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (slg)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Joint Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Dismissal. In light of the stipulated permanent injunction, the Court finds the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is now moot. See attached order for particulars. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 5/9/2019. (cmm)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin Jerome Feilmeyer on behalf of All Defendants (Feilmeyer, Franklin)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Stipulated Injunction and Stipulated Dismissal Pursuant to Parties' Settlement Agreement by Hydro-Klean, LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koopmans, Ryan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Hydro-Klean, LLC. (Koopmans, Ryan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hydro-Klean, LLC. Joseph Thomas served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Koopmans, Ryan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hydro-Klean, LLC. Central Power Washing, L.L.C. served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Koopmans, Ryan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (slg)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Expedited Relief Requested) by Hydro-Klean, LLC. Responses due by 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Reason Declaration of Wade Anderson, #2 Exhibit Ex A, #3 Exhibit Ex B, #4 Exhibit Ex C, #5 Brief in Support)(Koopmans, Ryan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Power Washing, L.L.C., Joseph Thomas Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3770286., filed by Hydro-Klean, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/19/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A (noncompete agmt))(Koopmans, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hydro-Klean, LLC v. Central Power Washing, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Power Washing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Franklin Jerome Feilmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Thomas
Represented By: Franklin Jerome Feilmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hydro-Klean, LLC
Represented By: Michael R Reck
Represented By: Ryan Gene Koopmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?