Peterson et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Iva Neppl and Christie Peterson
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00125
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (jeb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 9:00 AM, or as soon thereafter as it can be reached for trial, in Des Moines Courthouse before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. Estimated length 8 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Initial Disclosures due by 8/5/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 9/23/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/23/2019. Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/22/2019. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/23/2019. Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/22/2020. Discovery Deadline 3/6/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 4/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (jeb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/25/2019. Attorney Melissa Hasso appeared for plaintiffs. Attorney Samantha Rollins appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Total Court Time: 15 minutes. (jeb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Chanelle Han on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Han, Chanelle)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.., filed by Christie Peterson, Iva Neppl. (slg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Wilson, Emily)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER FOR PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: The parties have not filed a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as previously ordered. Dkt. #9 . The parties shall do so by noon on June 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/21/2019. (jeb)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs' Uncontested Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Local Rule 15, the Clerk of Court is directed to detach and docket the amended complaint attached to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/20/2019. (jeb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Unresisted MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Complaint by Iva Neppl, Christie Peterson.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Wilson, Emily)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER RESETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: At the request of defendant's counsel, the Scheduling Conference shall be held on June 25, 2019, at 10:00 AM by telephone. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (jeb)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference shall be held on June 20, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in the United States Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by June 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/12/2019. (jeb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Rollins, Samantha)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Rollins, Samantha)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Petition at Law and Jury Demand. As requested, defendant shall have until May 13, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 4/23/2019. (jeb)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Petition at Law and Jury Demand by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/7/2019. (Rollins, Samantha)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Filing by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. B)(Rollins, Samantha)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 5/13/2019. (slg)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Rollins, Samantha)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from Polk County, case number LACL143906. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3800277., filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Rollins, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iva Neppl
Represented By: Emily Elaine Wilson
Represented By: Melissa C Hasso
Represented By: Mark D Sherinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Peterson
Represented By: Emily Elaine Wilson
Represented By: Melissa C Hasso
Represented By: Mark D Sherinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Samantha Melanie Rollins
Represented By: Michael A Giudicessi
Represented By: Chanelle Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?