Miller v. Aquawood, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Heather Miller
Defendant: Chan Ming Yiu, Liu Yi Man, Chan Siu Lun, MGS International LLC, Toy Network L.L.C., Toy Network Hong Kong, Lisa Liu, Aquawood, L.L.C., Park Lane Solutions, Ltd., Toy Quest LTD, Michael Wu, Richard Toth, Brian Dubinsky, Banzai International Ltd., Manley Toy Direct L.L.C., Alan Chan, Samson Chan, Dollar Empire LLC, Ming Yiu Chan, Yi Man Liu and Siu Lun Chan
Case Number: 4:2019cv00134
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
2 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
3 Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heather Miller re #1 Complaint, Acceptance of Secondary Form of Service (Weisbrod, Stephen)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER granting #34 Defendant Michael Wu's unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Answer and/or Other Response to Complaint. As requested, defendant Michael Wu shall have until July 22, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (jeb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 34 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and/or Other Response by Michael Wu.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Weinhardt, Mark)
June 24, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M Shelton on behalf of Michael Wu (Shelton, Danielle)
June 24, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E Weinhardt on behalf of Michael Wu (Weinhardt, Mark)
June 21, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Miller. Michael Wu served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Weisbrod, Stephen)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen A. Weisbrod. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 6/20/2019. (slg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3849629 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Heather Miller. (Johnson, Bruce)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #26 Dollar Empire LLC's unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Answer and/or Other Response to Complaint. As requested, defendant Dollar Empire LLC shall have until July 22, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/20/2019. (jeb)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead. As requested, defendants Aquawood, LLC and Brian Dubinsky shall have until July 22, 2019 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/20/2019. (jeb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 26 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Other Response by Dollar Empire LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Weinhardt, Mark)
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 PUBLIC DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk sent documents through Fed Ex to Defendant in Hong Kong as requested in the attached correspondence. (kjw) Modified on 6/20/2019 (kjw).
June 17, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aquawood, L.L.C., Brian Dubinsky.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Locher, Stephen)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying without prejudice #10 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Court Clerk to Serve International Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(f)(2)(c)(ii) and 4(h)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/4/2019. (jeb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Callanan on behalf of Brian Dubinsky (Callanan, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen H. Locher on behalf of Brian Dubinsky (Locher, Stephen)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying without prejudice #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/4/2019. (jeb)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline of Answer to Complaint. As requested, defendant Aquawood, LLC, shall have until June 21, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/3/2019. (jeb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Miller. Brian Dubinsky served on 5/25/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Johnson, Bruce)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Callanan on behalf of Aquawood, L.L.C. (Callanan, Matthew)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Aquawood, L.L.C..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Locher, Stephen)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen H. Locher on behalf of Aquawood, L.L.C. (Locher, Stephen)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Dollar Empire LLC's unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Answer and/or Other Response to Complaint. As requested, defendant Dollar Empire LLC shall have until June 19, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/30/2019. (jeb)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M Shelton on behalf of Dollar Empire LLC (Shelton, Danielle)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Dollar Empire LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Weinhardt, Mark)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E Weinhardt on behalf of Dollar Empire LLC (Weinhardt, Mark)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION re #1 Complaint, by Heather Miller.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Bruce)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:19-cv-00123, 4:19-cv-00131, 4:19-cv-00132, 4:19-cv-00134, and 4:19-cv-00135 by Heather Miller.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Johnson, Bruce)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Miller. Richard Toth served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Johnson, Bruce)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Miller. MGS International LLC served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Johnson, Bruce)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Miller. Dollar Empire LLC served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Calland, Shelli)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Miller. Aquawood, L.L.C. served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Calland, Shelli)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Miller. Toy Network L.L.C. served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Calland, Shelli)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Miller. Manley Toy Direct L.L.C. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Calland, Shelli)
May 9, 2019 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner and Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) no longer assigned to case. (don)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1) (slg)
April 26, 2019 Senior Judge James E. Gritzner and Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer and Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3805433., filed by Heather Miller. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/25/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Aquawood, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chan Ming Yiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liu Yi Man
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chan Siu Lun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGS International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toy Network L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toy Network Hong Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aquawood, L.L.C.
Represented By: Matthew David Callanan
Represented By: Stephen H. Locher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Lane Solutions, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toy Quest LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wu
Represented By: Mark E Weinhardt
Represented By: Danielle M Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Dubinsky
Represented By: Matthew David Callanan
Represented By: Stephen H. Locher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banzai International Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manley Toy Direct L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samson Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Empire LLC
Represented By: Mark E Weinhardt
Represented By: Danielle M Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming Yiu Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yi Man Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siu Lun Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Miller
Represented By: Bruce E Johnson
Represented By: Stephen A. Weisbrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?