Goldsmith v. Adams County Iowa, et al
Plaintiff: Jon Goldsmith and Jon Richard Goldsmith
Defendant: Paul Hogan, Cory Dorsey, Adams County Sheriff's Office and Adams County Iowa
Case Number: 4:2019cv00152
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983vp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED INJUNCTION #11 . See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/8/2019. (imk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED DECREE Stipulated Injunction by Jon Richard Goldsmith. (Bettis Austen, Rita)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CANCELING ALL DEADLINES AND HEARINGS AND FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS. Dismissal Papers due by 8/1/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/2/2019. (imk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER CANCELING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. As discussed via email, the parties anticipate there will be no need for a scheduling conference or order in this case. The 7/1/2019 scheduling conference is canceled. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/28/2019. (imk)
June 26, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added as presider. Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle no longer assigned to case. (vr)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER. Upon the consent of the parties, and in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. section 636 (c), the parties waive their right to proceed before a Judge of the United States District Court and consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct any and all further proceedings and order the entry of judgment in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 6/25/2019. (alb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M Livingston on behalf of Adams County Iowa, Cory Dorsey, Paul Hogan (Livingston, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Aurora, Shefali)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shefali Aurora on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Aurora, Shefali)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Scheduling Conference shall be held on 7/1/2019 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Counsel outside of Des Moines may attend telephonically. If they choose to do so, counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 6/24/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/5/2019. (imk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Adams County Iowa, Cory Dorsey, Paul Hogan.(Madsen, Kristopher)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (vr)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3825343., filed by Jon Goldsmith. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 8/19/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 8/19/2019.(Bettis Austen, Rita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldsmith v. Adams County Iowa, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hogan
Represented By: Robert M Livingston
Represented By: Kristopher K Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Dorsey
Represented By: Robert M Livingston
Represented By: Kristopher K Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Iowa
Represented By: Robert M Livingston
Represented By: Kristopher K Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Goldsmith
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Glen Stephen Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Richard Goldsmith
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Glen Stephen Downey
Represented By: Shefali Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?