Bonneville v. Southwest Community College

Plaintiff: Mark D Bonneville
Defendant: Southwest Community College
Case Number: 4:2019cv00158
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Southwest Community College re #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Certificate of Service (Graham, Katie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Southwest Community College. Responses due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Graham, Katie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Lynn Graham on behalf of Southwest Community College (Graham, Katie)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark D Bonneville. Southwest Community College served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (slg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Southwest Community College. (kmc)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 6/14/2019. (jhn) Copy of Order mailed by Chambers to Mark D Bonneville, 2829 120th Street, Lorimor, IA 50149.
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark D Bonneville. (don)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southwest Community College, filed by Mark D Bonneville. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 8/26/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 supporting documents, #2 right to sue letter) (don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonneville v. Southwest Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Community College
Represented By: Katie Lynn Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark D Bonneville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?