Tasty Tacos, Inc. v. More Than Gourmet Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tasty Tacos, Inc.
Defendant: More Than Gourmet Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00166
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tasty Tacos, Inc.; More Than Gourmet Holdings, Inc. waiver served on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Kerndt, Allison)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 1,774,502, 87/689,845 and 88/267,384. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (don)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (don)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against More Than Gourmet Holdings, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3838897., filed by Tasty Tacos, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/4/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/4/2019.(Kerndt, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tasty Tacos, Inc. v. More Than Gourmet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: More Than Gourmet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasty Tacos, Inc.
Represented By: McGuire A Matthew
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Kerndt
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Represented By: Matthew A. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?