Pella Corporation v. Apogee Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pella Corporation
Defendant: EFCO Corporation and Apogee Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00209
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Apogee Enterprises, Inc. answer due 9/20/2019; EFCO Corporation answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/5/2019. (mlr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Apogee Enterprises, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Kroll, Kyle)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER Granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' deadline to answer, counterclaim, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 9/6/2019. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 8/23/2019. (hfh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Apogee Enterprises, Inc., EFCO Corporation.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Windler, Joseph)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph Windler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 8/15/2019. (slg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3896256 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Apogee Enterprises, Inc., EFCO Corporation. (Windler, Joseph)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew C. Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 8/12/2019. (slg)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to and including August 23, 2019, as to all Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 8/12/2019. (mlr)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3892897 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Apogee Enterprises, Inc., EFCO Corporation. (Robinson, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey P. Justman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 8/9/2019. (kjw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Monika Sehic on behalf of Pella Corporation (Sehic, Monika)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3891035 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Pella Corporation. (Combs, Terri)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kyle Robert Kroll. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 8/8/2019. (kjw)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3889823 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Apogee Enterprises, Inc., EFCO Corporation. (Kroll, Kyle)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Apogee Enterprises, Inc., EFCO Corporation.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Boyd, Thomas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pella Corporation. Apogee Enterprises, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Combs, Terri)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pella Corporation. EFCO Corporation served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Combs, Terri)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Pella Corporation. (Combs, Terri)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (sjc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3867173., filed by Pella Corporation. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 10/10/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Combs, Terri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pella Corporation v. Apogee Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFCO Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Michael Windler
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Matthew C. Robinson
Represented By: Kyle Robert Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apogee Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Michael Windler
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Matthew C. Robinson
Represented By: Kyle Robert Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pella Corporation
Represented By: Terri L. Combs
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Monika Sehic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?