White v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nancy C. White
Defendant: Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, Centerville Community School District and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00254
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441eb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/2/2019. Attorney Amanda Bartusek appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Steven Davidson appeared for defendants The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. & Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company. Attorney Gayla Harrison appeared for defendant Centerville Community School District. With agreement of counsel, entry of scheduling order postponed due to pending Motion to Dismiss #10 . Total Court Time: 11 minutes. (jeb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Centerville Community School District. Responses due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Harrison, Gayla)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Bartusek, Amanda)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on October 2, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by September 30, 2019. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/19/2019. (jeb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc..(Davidson, Steven)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond. As requested, defendants Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. shall have until September 13, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 8/30/2019. (jeb)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven Davidson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 8/15/2019. (slg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Guttau-Fox, Heidi)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Guttau-Fox, Heidi)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, in compliance with Local Rule 7.1. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 9/3/2019. (slg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. from District Court in and For Appanoose County, case number LALA002562. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3894351., filed by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Removal State Court, #3 Exhibit C - L.R. 81 Statement)(Guttau-Fox, Heidi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven D Davidson
Represented By: Heidi A Guttau-Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerville Community School District
Represented By: Gayla R Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Steven D Davidson
Represented By: Heidi A Guttau-Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy C. White
Represented By: Amanda Marie Bartusek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?