Campbell v. Hoyt Sherman Place Foundation
Plaintiff: Brian C. Campbell
Defendant: Hoyt Sherman Place Foundation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00291
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:020
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/1/2019. (jeb)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Bench Trial set to begin 2/16/2021 9:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse, Room 160, before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger for estimated 4 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2021 8:30 AM in Des Moines Courthouse, Room 160, before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Initial Disclosures due by 12/20/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 2/7/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/7/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/2/2020. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 5/1/2020. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 6/5/2020. Discovery Deadline 6/5/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 7/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/1/2019. (jeb)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/31/2019. Attorney Harley Erbe appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Susan Elgin appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 15 minutes. (jeb)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER TO CONDUCT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE: Due to changes to the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference set for October 31, 2019 at 10:00 AM shall be conducted by telephone. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/25/2019. (jeb)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference shall be held on October 31, 2019 at 10:00 AM in the United States Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/18/2019. (jeb)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/17/2019. (jeb)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. The court approves and will enter the stipulated protective order submitted with the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/17/2019. (jeb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Hoyt Sherman Place Foundation.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Elgin, Susan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Elgin, Susan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Hoyt Sherman Place Foundation. (Elgin, Susan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hoyt Sherman Place Foundation.(Elgin, Susan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Filing by Hoyt Sherman Place Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Ex. B)(Elgin, Susan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE by Hoyt Sherman Place Foundation. (Elgin, Susan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hoyt Sherman Place Foundation from Polk County, case number LACL145371. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3918226., filed by Hoyt Sherman Place Foundation. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Elgin, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Hoyt Sherman Place Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian C. Campbell
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyt Sherman Place Foundation
Represented By: Michael A Giudicessi
Represented By: Susan Patricia Elgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?