Williams IV et al v. Dave Wright BHG, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LATONYA WILLIAMS, PERCY DEE WILLIAMS IV and Percy Dee Williams, IV
Defendant: DAVE WRIGHT BHG, INC., TYLER J. WRIGHT, DAVE WRIGHT CDRJ, INC., DAVID J. WRIGHT and Dave Wright BGH, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00300
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants. All Defendants. Party Dave Wright BHG, Inc. terminated., filed by Percy Dee Williams, IV, Latonya Williams.(Ogden, Dennis)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Frances M. Haas on behalf of Dave Wright BHG, Inc., Dave Wright CDRJ, Inc., David J. Wright, Tyler J. Wright (Haas, Frances)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Clinton Goodhue on behalf of All Defendants (Goodhue, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Percy Dee Williams, IV, Latonya Williams; All Defendants. Waiver served on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Ogden, Dennis) Modified on 9/25/2019 to Add Service and Answer Dates (kmc).
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (vr)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3924020., filed by PERCY DEE WILLIAMS IV, LATONYA WILLIAMS. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/16/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ogden, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams IV et al v. Dave Wright BHG, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATONYA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERCY DEE WILLIAMS IV
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Dee Williams, IV
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE WRIGHT BHG, INC.
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Thomas Clinton Goodhue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYLER J. WRIGHT
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Thomas Clinton Goodhue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE WRIGHT CDRJ, INC.
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Thomas Clinton Goodhue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID J. WRIGHT
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Thomas Clinton Goodhue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Wright BGH, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?