Seger et al v. Lindaman et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Seger, I.G. Seger, Isabell G. Seger and Kimberly R. Seger
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, MD Lynn Lindaman, Lynn Lindaman, M.D., P.L.C., Wellmark, Inc., Lynn M. Lindaman and Lynn M. Lindaman, M.D., P.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00301
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
2 Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 05:8901
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER The Court grants #7 Motion to Dismiss Party Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association and Wellmark, Inc. and denies as moot #2 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 11/1/2019. (kjw)
October 30, 2019 Motions terminated as moot: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Lynn M. Lindaman, M.D., P.L.C., Lynn M. Lindaman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/30/2019. (mlr)
October 30, 2019 Filing 21 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held by telephone conference call before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 10/30/2019 re #2 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lynn M. Lindaman, M.D., P.L.C., Lynn M. Lindaman, #7 and MOTION to Dismiss filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Wellmark, Inc. Arguments heard. Matter deemed submitted for ruling. (Court Reporter Terri Martin) (alb)
October 24, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: motion hearing set for 10/30/2019 11:00 AM by phone hearing with Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. See order for particulars. (alb)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER. Hearing on all pending motions will be held by telephone conference call at 11:00 a.m. on 10/30/19. To join the call, counsel shall call 1-888-636-3807, using the access code: 5261674. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 10/24/2019. (alb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY Memorandum In Support of Their re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Wellmark, Inc..(Duffy, Keith)
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Isabell G. Seger, Kimberly R. Seger. Replies due by 10/23/2019.(Reilly, Matthew)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File resistance to Motion to Dismiss to October 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/11/2019. (mlr)
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Motion to Dismiss by Isabell G. Seger, Kimberly R. Seger.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 10/23/2019. (Reilly, Matthew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Resistance filed by Lynn M. Lindaman, Lynn M. Lindaman, M.D., P.L.C.. Replies due by 10/16/2019.(Oxley, Dana)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Lynn M. Lindaman, M.D., P.L.C.. (Penner, Nancy)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Duffy, Keith)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wellmark, Inc.. (Duffy, Keith)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue without date the hearing scheduled to be held on 10/3/19. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 9/27/2019. (alb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 Unresisted MOTION to Continue October 3, 2019 Hearing by Lynn M. Lindaman, Lynn M. Lindaman, M.D., P.L.C..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 10/10/2019. (Oxley, Dana)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana L. Oxley on behalf of Lynn M. Lindaman, Lynn M. Lindaman, M.D., P.L.C. (Oxley, Dana)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 ***Errata, correction of certificate of service to #7 *** MOTION to Dismiss correcting Certificate of Service by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Wellmark, Inc.. Responses due by 10/9/2019. (Duffy, Keith) Modified on 9/30/2019 (kjw).
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Wellmark, Inc.. Responses due by 10/8/2019. (Duffy, Keith)
September 19, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: motion hearing set for 10/3/2019 11:00 AM by telephone conference call before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. See ORDER for phone number and access code. (alb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER. Hearing on the resisted motion for partial summary judgment (Docket #2) will be held by telephone conference call at 11:00 a.m. on 10/3/19. To join the call, counsel shall call 1-888-636-3807, using the access code: 5261674. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 9/19/2019. (alb)
September 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added. Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (don)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendants 10/10/2019. (kjw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Lynn M. Lindaman, Lynn M. Lindaman, M.D., P.L.C. Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 10/3/2019. (kjw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Isabell G. Seger, Kimberly R. Seger. Replies due by 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Response to Statement of Material Facts) (kjw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Lynn M. Lindaman, Lynn M. Lindaman, M.D., P.L.C.. Responses due by 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Material Facts) (kjw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Wellmark, Inc. from In the Iowa District for Polk County, case number LACL133954. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3925249., filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Wellmark, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exh 1 State Court Documents, #2 Exh 2 BCNBS 2013 Contract, #3 Exh 3 BCBS 2014 Service Benefit Plan, #4 Exh 4 BCBS 2015 Service Benefit Plan, #5 Exh 5 BCBS 2016 Service Benefit Plan, #6 Exh 6 BCBS 2017 Service Benefit Plan, #7 Exh 7 BCBS 2018 Service Benefit Plan, #8 Exh 8 BCBS 2019 Service Benefit Plan, #9 Exh 9 Fed 2014 Employees Health Benefits Program, #10 Exh 10 Fed 2015 Employees Health Benefits Program, #11 Exh 11 Fed 2016 Employees Health Benefits Program, #12 Exh 12 Fed 2017 Employees Health Benefits Program, #13 Exh 13 Fed 2018 Employees Health Benefits Program, #14 Exh 14BCBS 2019A Amendment 1039, #15 Exh 15 States Mtn S/J paperwork, #16 Local Rule 81 Statement)(Duffy, Keith) Modified on 9/19/2019 added wording to exhibits for clarification(don).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seger et al v. Lindaman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association
Represented By: Joseph A Quinn
Represented By: Keith Patrick Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Lynn Lindaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Lindaman, M.D., P.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A Quinn
Represented By: Keith Patrick Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn M. Lindaman
Represented By: Dana L. Oxley
Represented By: Nancy J Penner
Represented By: Robert D Houghton
Represented By: Jennifer E. Rinden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn M. Lindaman, M.D., P.L.C.
Represented By: Dana L. Oxley
Represented By: Nancy J Penner
Represented By: Robert D Houghton
Represented By: Jennifer E. Rinden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Seger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.G. Seger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabell G. Seger
Represented By: J Russell Hixson
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Represented By: Dominic F Pechota
Represented By: Blake E Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly R. Seger
Represented By: J Russell Hixson
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Represented By: Dominic F Pechota
Represented By: Blake E Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?