Webster v. Westlake et al
Plaintiff: Trenisha Webster
Defendant: Des Moines Police Department, Jennifer Westlake, Lori Kelly and Des Moines, Iowa
Case Number: 4:2019cv00302
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983vp
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An In-Person Scheduling Conference shall be held on 12/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 12/4/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/6/2019. (imk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Des Moines, Iowa, Lori Kelly, Jennifer Westlake.(Mackel-Wiederanders, Michelle)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trenisha Webster. Des Moines, Iowa served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Brown, Brandon)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trenisha Webster. Lori Kelly served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019; Jennifer Westlake served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Brown, Brandon)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (vr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3925861., filed by Trenisha Webster. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/18/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/18/2019.(Brown, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Westlake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Des Moines Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Westlake
Represented By: Michelle Mackel-Wiederanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Kelly
Represented By: Michelle Mackel-Wiederanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Des Moines, Iowa
Represented By: Michelle Mackel-Wiederanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trenisha Webster
Represented By: Brandon John Brown
Represented By: Heidi Marie Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?