Taylor v. Phillipellie
Plaintiff: Jackie Taylor
Defendant: Phillipellie
Interested Party: William A Hill
Case Number: 4:2019cv00315
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jackie Taylor. See docket entry #4 for image. Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 12/4/2019. (slg)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Jackie Taylor. (slg)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting permission to proceed in forma pauperis; directing Plaintiff to file amended petition on or before November 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 10/22/2019. (ptb)
October 3, 2019 Judge Stephanie M. Rose added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jackie Taylor. (kjw)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phillipellie, filed by Jackie Taylor. (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Phillipellie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillipellie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William A Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?