Smith v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Wayne Smith
Defendant: Weaver and United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00322
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk's Office to Plaintiff re case transfer to WVND. (slg)
October 22, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically transferred to Northern District of West Virginia. (slg)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Transferring Case. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 10/21/2019. Copy of Order mailed by chambers to pro se plaintiff. (hfh)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, Weaver, filed by Nathan Wayne Smith. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/6/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/6/2020. (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Wayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?